WI SB130 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 70.03 (1) and 70.32 (1); and to create 70.32 (1b) and 70.32 (1d) of the statutes; Relating to: property tax assessments regarding leased property and assessments based on comparable sales and market segments. (FE)
Title
Property tax assessments regarding leased property and assessments based on comparable sales and market segments. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Refused to withdraw from committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions (Y: 14 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Representative Considine added as a cosponsor |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Representative McGuire added as a cosponsor |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Representative Pope added as a cosponsor |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Representative Vruwink added as a cosponsor |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 14, Noes 18 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Representative Ramthun added as a cosponsor |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Representative Spreitzer added as a cosponsor |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Introduced |