WI SB133 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 31-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 31-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 460.17; to amend 460.15; and to create 460.14 (4) and 460.17 (2) of the statutes; Relating to: violations of the law relating to the practice of massage therapy or bodywork therapy and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Violations of the law relating to the practice of massage therapy or bodywork therapy and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Kooyenga |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Representative Skowronski added as a cosponsor |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senator Marklein added as a coauthor |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb133 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB133.pdf |