WI SB139 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 944.17 (2) (a), 944.17 (2) (c) and 944.17 (2) (d); to renumber and amend 944.17 (2) (intro.); to amend 173.07 (1), 173.10, 173.13 (1) (a) 8., 173.21 (1) (a), 173.22 (4) (d) (intro.), 173.22 (4) (d) 1., 173.22 (4) (d) 2., 173.22 (4) (e) and 301.45 (1d) (b); and to create 944.18 and 948.015 (11) of the statutes; Relating to: sexual contact with an animal and providing a penalty.
Title
Sexual contact with an animal and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Published 3-4-2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-3-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 162 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 2-28-2020 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | LRB correction (Senate Amendment 1) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2020-02-11 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-11 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2020-02-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-11 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-11 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-11 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2019-10-08 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-8-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-09-23 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Introduced |