WI SB144 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-3)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-08-13 - Public hearing held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber 16.303 (1); to amend 16.303 (2) (intro.), 16.303 (3) (a), 16.303 (3) (b) and 16.304 (1) (a); and to create 16.303 (1g) and 16.303 (1r) (am) of the statutes; Relating to: grants to defray housing costs and for diversion programming and making an appropriation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grants to defray housing costs and for diversion programming and making an appropriation. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-13SenatePublic hearing held
2019-07-22SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Olsen
2019-04-25SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-04-04SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Utilities and Housing
2019-04-04SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback