WI SB146 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 31-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 31-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 74.11 (4), 74.11 (7), 74.11 (8), 74.11 (10) (a), 74.12 (6), 74.12 (7) and 74.12 (8); to amend 74.12 (9) (a) and 74.69 (1); and to create 74.11 (4) (b), 74.11 (7) (b), 74.11 (8) (b), 74.11 (10) (a) 2., 74.12 (6) (b), 74.12 (7) (b), 74.12 (8) (b) and 74.12 (9) (am) of the statutes; Relating to: due dates for paying property taxes. (FE)
Title
Due dates for paying property taxes. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Local Government, Small Business, Tourism and Workforce Development, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Senator Miller added as a coauthor |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government, Small Business, Tourism and Workforce Development |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb146 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB146.pdf |