WI SB15 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.192 (1) (c) and 238.137 of the statutes; Relating to: new internship grants and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
New internship grants and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Feyen [R] | Sen. Alberta Darling [R] | Sen. Van Wanggaard [R] | Rep. Michael Rohrkaste [R] |
Rep. Rick Gundrum [R] | Rep. Robert Kulp [R] | Rep. Timothy Ramthun [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Trade, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Trade, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Feyen |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Trade |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb15 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB15.pdf |