WI SB155 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-26 - Published 11-26-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-26 - Published 11-26-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 146.89 (3) (a) and 146.89 (3) (d) 2.; and to create 146.89 (3g) of the statutes; Relating to: participation in the Volunteer Health Care Provider program by agencies serving homeless individuals. (FE)
Title
Participation in the Volunteer Health Care Provider program by agencies serving homeless individuals. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-26 | Senate | Published 11-26-2019 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 11-25-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 57 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 11-19-2019 by directive of the President, pursuant to Senate Rule 44m (3) |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2019-11-08 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2019-11-07 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-07 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2019-11-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-11-07 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-07 | House | Read a second time |
2019-11-07 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2019-11-05 | House | Read first time and referred to calendar of 11-7-2019 pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (1)(a) |
2019-11-05 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-11-04 | Senate | Senator Craig added as a coauthor |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-07-16 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Introduced |