WI SB158 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Passed on February 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Published 2-6-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Passed on February 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Published 2-6-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 49.141 (1) (i) and 767.84 (1) (a); to amend 48.02 (13), 48.27 (5), 48.396 (2) (dm), 48.42 (4) (b) 2., 48.837 (4) (e), 48.91 (2), 49.225 (2) (a), 49.855 (3), 49.855 (4m) (b), 69.15 (3) (a) (intro.), 69.15 (3) (a) 3., 565.30 (5m) (a), 767.407 (1) (c) (intro.), 767.41 (1) (b), 767.41 (1m) (intro.), 767.44 (1), 767.511 (1) (intro.), 767.511 (5), 767.513 (2), 767.55 (1), 767.55 (2) (am) (intro.), 767.55 (3) (a) 1., 767.55 (3) (d), 767.55 (4) (b) (intro.), 767.59 (2s), 767.73 (1) (a), 767.75 (1) (b), 767.77 (1), 767.78 (1), 767.80 (1) (intro.), 767.80 (1) (c), 767.80 (5m), 767.80 (6m), 767.82 (2), 767.82 (2m), 767.855, 767.87 (8), 802.12 (3) (d) 1., 802.12 (3) (d) 3., 808.075 (4) (d) 9., 808.075 (4) (d) 10., 852.05 (2), 938.02 (13), 938.27 (5) and 938.396 (2g) (g); and to create 49.141 (1) (i) 3., 49.141 (1) (j) 6., 767.80 (1) (hm), 767.804, 767.84 (1) (a) 1., 767.84 (1) (a) 2., 767.84 (1) (a) 3., 769.201 (1m) (gm) and 891.407 of the statutes; Relating to: presumption and conclusive determination of paternity on the basis of genetic test results and orders that may be granted on the basis of genetic test results. (FE)
Title
Presumption and conclusive determination of paternity on the basis of genetic test results and orders that may be granted on the basis of genetic test results. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | Published 2-6-2020 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 2-5-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 95 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 2-3-2020 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2020-01-21 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-21 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2020-01-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-01-21 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-21 | House | Read a second time |
2020-01-16 | House | Placed on calendar 1-21-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2020-01-16 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2019-10-08 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-8-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-09-30 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-30 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Introduced |