WI SB160 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Passed on February 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Published 2-6-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Passed on February 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Published 2-6-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 120.11 (2); and to create 120.11 (2) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: the method for providing notice of a special meeting of a school board. (FE)
Title
The method for providing notice of a special meeting of a school board. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | Published 2-6-2020 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 2-5-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 96 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 2-3-2020 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2020-01-21 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-21 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2020-01-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-01-21 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-21 | House | Read a second time |
2020-01-16 | House | Placed on calendar 1-21-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2020-01-16 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2019-10-08 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-8-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Introduced |