WI SB163 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 30-3)
Status: Passed on February 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Published 2-6-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 30-3)
Status: Passed on February 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Published 2-6-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 940.20 (2r) of the statutes; Relating to: causing bodily harm to a nurse and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Causing bodily harm to a nurse and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-21 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | Published 2-6-2020 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 2-5-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 97 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 2-3-2020 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2020-01-21 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-21 | House | Representative Sinicki withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2020-01-21 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2020-01-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-01-21 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-21 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 62, Noes 36 |
2020-01-21 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Spreitzer, Emerson, Crowley, Stubbs and McGuire |
2020-01-21 | House | Read a second time |
2020-01-16 | House | Placed on calendar 1-21-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2020-01-16 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2019-11-06 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-11-04 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Kooyenga |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-09-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Representative Fields added as a cosponsor |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Introduced |