WI SB169 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 50-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 50-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 23.33 (3c), 29.089 (2), 29.091 (2), 29.621 (4) (a) to (d), 165.81 (2), 167.31 (1) (cm) and (2) (a) and (b), 167.31 (3) (a) 2., 167.31 (4) (ag), 167.31 (4) (am) 2. and 3., 167.31 (4) (bg), (bn) and (bt), 167.31 (4) (cm) and (d), 173.07 (5) (b), 175.60 (1) (dm) and (h), 175.60 (1) (i) 2., 175.60 (2g), 175.60 (2m) (bm), 175.60 (3) (f), 175.60 (3) (g), 175.60 (11) (b) 2., 3. and 4., 175.60 (16), 175.60 (17) (a), (ac) and (b), 440.26 (3m), 939.22 (20s), 939.32 (1) (e), 941.23, 941.235, 941.237 (1) (a) to (dr) and (em) to (g), 941.237 (3), 948.605 and 973.137 (1) and (2); to renumber 66.0409 (1) (a), 175.60 (12) (b) 1. a. and b., 175.60 (13) and 943.13 (4m) (am); to renumber and amend 29.091 (1), 29.621 (4) (intro.), 167.31 (4) (am) 1., 175.60 (11) (b) 1., 175.60 (12) (b) 2., 175.60 (15m), 175.60 (21) (c) and 943.13 (4m) (bm); to consolidate, renumber and amend 167.31 (3) (a) (intro.) and 1., 175.60 (1) (i) (intro.) and 1., 941.237 (1) (intro.) and (e) and 973.137 (intro.) and (1m); to amend 29.301 (1) (b), 29.314 (3) (title) and (a) and (4) (title) and (a), 29.921 (1), 66.0409 (2), 66.0409 (3) (a) and (c) and (6), 110.07 (1) (a) 1. and 3. and (b), 167.31 (1) (c), 167.31 (2) (c), (d) and (e), 167.31 (4) (a) (intro.), 167.31 (4) (b), 167.31 (4) (c) and (cg) (intro.), 167.31 (4) (f) and (i), 175.60 (1) (bm), 175.60 (1) (j), 175.60 (2) (c) and (d), 175.60 (2m) (a), 175.60 (4) (a) (intro.) and (5) (a) (intro.) and 1., 175.60 (5) (a) 6., 175.60 (7) (e) and (9) (b) 2., 175.60 (13) (title), 175.60 (14) (a) and (am), 345.11 (1s), 345.20 (2) (f), 895.527 (5) (a), 938.34 (14q), 938.78 (3), 939.22 (10), 939.632 (1) (e) 3., 941.237 (2), 941.299 (1) (a), 943.13 (1m) (c) 2. and 4., 947.01 (2), 948.60 (1) and 968.255 (1) (a) 2.; to repeal and recreate 941.295; and to create 66.0409 (1) (ag), 66.0409 (2m), 167.31 (4) (a) 1., 175.60 (2) (e), 175.60 (2m) (am), 175.60 (5) (a) 1m., 175.60 (12) (b) 2. c., 175.60 (12g) (a) 4., 175.60 (13) (b), 939.22 (11m), 939.22 (13), 943.13 (1e) (g), 943.13 (1n), 943.13 (1p) and 943.13 (2) (bm) 3. of the statutes; Relating to: going armed with a firearm and electric weapons, licenses for carrying a concealed weapon, trespassing while armed with a firearm, and providing criminal penalties. (FE)
Title
Going armed with a firearm and electric weapons, licenses for carrying a concealed weapon, trespassing while armed with a firearm, and providing criminal penalties. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Report introduction of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb169 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB169.pdf |