WI SB170 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-9)
Status: Passed on November 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-26 - Published 11-26-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-9)
Status: Passed on November 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-26 - Published 11-26-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 97.30 (1) (c); and to create 66.0416 and 97.29 (1) (h) 12m. of the statutes; Relating to: allowing minors to operate temporary stands without a permit or license. (FE)
Title
Allowing minors to operate temporary stands without a permit or license. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-26 | Senate | Published 11-26-2019 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 11-25-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 60 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 11-19-2019 by directive of the President, pursuant to Senate Rule 44m (3) |
2019-10-11 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2019-10-11 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2019-10-10 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-10-10 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2019-10-10 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-10-10 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-10-10 | House | Read a second time |
2019-10-10 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2019-10-08 | House | Placed on calendar 10-10-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-10-08 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2019-10-08 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-8-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-09-26 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-26 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-26 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-26 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Representative Bowen added as a cosponsor |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Representative Schraa added as a cosponsor |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Kooyenga |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Introduced |