WI SB173 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 43-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 43-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 448.02 (3) (a); and to create 253.10 (3) (c) 2. es. and 253.103 of the statutes; Relating to: sex-selective, disability-selective, and other selective abortions and providing a penalty.
Title
Sex-selective, disability-selective, and other selective abortions and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb173 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB173.pdf |