WI SB18 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 76-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 76-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.05 (22) (dp) 1., 71.05 (22) (dp) 2. and 71.05 (22) (dt); and to create 71.05 (22) (dq) and 71.64 (9) (b) 3. of the statutes; Relating to: increasing the maximum deduction under the individual income tax sliding scale standard deduction. (FE)
Title
Increasing the maximum deduction under the individual income tax sliding scale standard deduction. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | LRB correction |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Report passage as amended, with emergency statement attached, pursuant to s. 16.47 (2), Wisconsin Statutes, recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 10, Noes 3 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb18 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB18.pdf |