WI SB184 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 118.193 (2) (b); to amend 118.193 (2) (intro.); and to create 118.193 (2) (b) 2. and 118.193 (5) of the statutes; Relating to: a license to teach based on reciprocity and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
A license to teach based on reciprocity and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-07-29 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Representatives Ramthun and Quinn added as cosponsors |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb184 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB184.pdf |