WI SB188 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-12)
Status: Passed on November 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-26 - Published 11-27-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-12)
Status: Passed on November 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-26 - Published 11-27-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 23.33 (1) (jo) 5., 23.335 (1) (zgm) 5., 30.50 (10m) (e), 94.55 (2) (e), 94.55 (3), 94.55 (3) (c), 94.67 (15r), 340.01 (50m) (e), 350.01 (10v) (e), 885.235 (1) (d) 5., 939.22 (33) (e), 961.32 (3) (b) 2. and 967.055 (1m) (b) 5.; to amend 20.115 (7) (gc), 23.33 (4c) (a) 5., 23.33 (4c) (b) 4. b., 23.335 (12) (a) 5., 23.335 (12) (b) 5., 30.681 (1) (d), 30.681 (2) (d) 1. b., 94.55 (1), 94.55 (2) (title), 94.55 (2) (a), 94.55 (2) (b) 2., 94.55 (2) (b) 3., 94.55 (2) (b) 4., 94.55 (2) (b) 5., 94.55 (2) (c), 94.67 (2), 97.02, 182.001 (3), 343.305 (8) (b) 2. g., 343.305 (8) (b) 4m. (intro.), 343.305 (8) (b) 4m. a., 343.305 (8) (b) 5. c., 346.63 (1) (d), 346.63 (2) (b) 2., 348.27 (18) (a) 1. f., 350.101 (1) (e), 350.101 (2) (d) 2., 940.09 (2) (b), 940.25 (2) (b), 941.20 (1) (bm), 961.01 (14), 961.14 (4) (t) 1., 961.32 (2m) (b), 961.32 (3) (a) 1. and 2., 961.32 (3) (b) (intro.), 961.32 (3) (b) 1., 961.32 (3) (b) 3., 961.32 (3) (b) 4., 961.32 (3) (b) 5., 961.32 (3) (c), 961.32 (3) (d), 961.34 (2) (a), 961.34 (2) (b), 961.38 (1n) (a), 961.38 (1n) (b), 961.442 (intro.) and 961.55 (9); to repeal and recreate 94.55 (title); and to create 20.115 (7) (f), 94.55 (2) (am), 94.55 (2) (b) 2m., 94.55 (2) (b) 4g., 94.55 (2) (b) 4m., 94.55 (2) (b) 4s., 94.55 (2) (f), 94.55 (2g), 94.55 (2m), 94.55 (2p), 94.55 (2r), 94.55 (2t), 94.55 (3m), 94.55 (3r), 94.55 (3w), 94.67 (15c), 961.01 (3r), 961.14 (4) (t) 3., 961.32 (3) (b) 4m., 961.32 (3) (b) 4r. and 961.32 (3) (cm) of the statutes; Relating to: regulating hemp, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Regulating hemp, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-12 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-08 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-08 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-26 | Senate | Published 11-27-2019 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 11-26-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 68 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 11-19-2019 by directive of the President, pursuant to Senate Rule 44m (3) |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2019-11-18 | Senate | LRB correction |
2019-11-18 | Senate | LRB correction (Senate Amendment 1) |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2019-11-12 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-12 | House | Representative Zamarripa added as a cosponsor |
2019-11-12 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 95, Noes 0 |
2019-11-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-11-12 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-12 | House | Read a second time |
2019-11-12 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2019-11-07 | House | Placed on calendar 11-12-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-11-06 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2019-11-04 | House | Representative Edming added as a cosponsor |
2019-10-08 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Senator Hansen added as a coauthor |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 31, Noes 2 |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-8-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-10-02 | Senate | Representative Kitchens added as a cosponsor |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-08-14 | Senate | Representative Bowen added as a cosponsor |
2019-08-12 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Testin and L. Taylor |
2019-07-22 | Senate | Representative Brostoff added as a cosponsor |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-17 | Senate | LRB correction |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Representative Ohnstad added as a cosponsor |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Introduced |