WI SB190 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 343.61 (4) (bm) of the statutes; Relating to: driver school offices in private residences.
Title
Driver school offices in private residences.
Sponsors
Sen. Dale Kooyenga [R] | Sen. Luther Olsen [R] | Rep. Shannon Zimmerman [R] | Rep. Robert Kulp [R] |
Rep. Janel Brandtjen [R] | Rep. Mike Kuglitsch [R] | Rep. John Spiros [R] | Sen. Dan Knodl [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-08-15 | Senate | Representative Allen added as a cosponsor |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb190 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB190.pdf |