WI SB194 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: funding for joint programming between the University of Wisconsin-Green Bay and the Oneida Tribe and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Funding for joint programming between the University of Wisconsin-Green Bay and the Oneida Tribe and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb194 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB194.pdf |