WI SB200 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 165.77 (7) and 175.405; to amend 165.845 (title), 165.845 (1) (a), 165.845 (1) (b) and 165.845 (2); and to create 165.775, 165.845 (1) (d) and 895.537 of the statutes; Relating to: storage and processing of sexual assault kits and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Storage and processing of sexual assault kits and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from Senate message and take up (Y: 36 N: 62 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-18 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-11 | House | Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from Senate message and take up, Ayes 36, Noes 62 |
2019-12-04 | House | Representative Anderson added as a cosponsor |
2019-12-03 | House | Representatives Haywood and Crowley added as cosponsors |
2019-11-27 | House | Representative Vruwink added as a cosponsor |
2019-11-25 | House | Representatives Kolste, Stubbs and Hebl added as cosponsors |
2019-11-21 | House | Representative Zamarripa added as a cosponsor |
2019-11-20 | House | Representatives Hesselbein, Goyke, Billings and Hintz added as cosponsors |
2019-11-19 | House | Representatives Stuck, Milroy and Riemer added as cosponsors |
2019-10-08 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Senator Miller added as a coauthor |
2019-10-07 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-07 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-8-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Representative Fields added as a cosponsor |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Representative Neubauer added as a cosponsor |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Representative Gruszynski added as a cosponsor |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Representative Skowronski added as a cosponsor |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Senator Wirch added as a coauthor |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Introduced |