WI SB205 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-3)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber and amend 36.31 (4) and 38.12 (7) (b); and to create 36.31 (4) (bm) and 38.12 (7) (b) 2m. of the statutes; Relating to: transferring academic credits from military transcripts to University of Wisconsin System schools and technical colleges. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transferring academic credits from military transcripts to University of Wisconsin System schools and technical colleges. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - House - Assembly: Decision of the Chair upheld (Y: 62 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04SenatePublished 3-4-2020
2020-03-04SenateReport approved by the Governor on 3-3-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 147
2020-02-28SenatePresented to the Governor on 2-28-2020
2020-02-25SenateReport correctly enrolled
2020-02-21SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2020-02-20HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-20HouseRead a third time and concurred in
2020-02-20HouseRules suspended
2020-02-20HouseOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-20HouseDecision of the Chair upheld, Ayes 62, Noes 35
2020-02-20HouseDecision of the Chair appealed
2020-02-20HousePoint of order that Assembly Amendment 2 not germane under Assembly Rule 54 (3)(f) well taken
2020-02-20HouseAssembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Shankland
2020-02-20HouseAssembly Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author
2020-02-20HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Swearingen
2020-02-20HouseRead a second time
2020-02-18HouseMade a special order of business at 11:31 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21
2020-02-18HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2020-01-30HouseRepresentative Wittke added as a cosponsor
2019-11-06HouseReceived from Senate
2019-11-05SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2019-11-05SenateRead a third time and passed
2019-11-05SenateRules suspended
2019-11-05SenateOrdered to a third reading
2019-11-05SenateRead a second time
2019-11-05SenateSenator Carpenter added as a coauthor
2019-11-01SenatePlaced on calendar 11-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2019-10-16SenateAvailable for scheduling
2019-10-16SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families, Ayes 7, Noes 0
2019-10-15SenateExecutive action taken
2019-09-25SenatePublic hearing held
2019-05-23SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-05-23SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-05-08SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families
2019-05-08SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback