WI SB214 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-22 - Published 1-22-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-22 - Published 1-22-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 800.14 (2); to renumber 343.301 (1m) and 814.61 (5); to renumber and amend 800.085 (2), 800.095 (3) and 800.14 (4); to amend 49.90 (12), 49.90 (13) (c), 66.0113 (1) (b) 6., 66.0113 (1) (b) 7. b., 303.18 (2), 755.01 (1), 755.01 (4), 755.17 (1m), 755.17 (2), 799.29 (2), 800.035 (2) (e), 800.035 (5) (a), 800.035 (5) (c), 800.05 (3), 800.06 (1), 800.093 (1) (b), 800.095 (6), 800.095 (7), 800.115 (4), 800.115 (5), 800.13 (1), 800.14 (1), 800.14 (3), 800.14 (5), 806.10 (1) (intro.), 806.14, 814.63 (2), 814.63 (4) and 885.04; and to create 343.301 (1m) (b), 800.005, 800.035 (2) (a) 5., 800.085 (2) (a) to (i), 800.09 (4), 800.095 (3) (c), 800.14 (2m), 800.14 (4) (b) and 814.61 (5) (bm) of the statutes; Relating to: municipal ordinance enforcement and court procedures. (FE)
Title
Municipal ordinance enforcement and court procedures. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | Senate | Published 1-22-2020 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 1-21-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 70 |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 1-17-2020 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | LRB correction (Senate Amendment 1) |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2020-01-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-15 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2020-01-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-01-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-15 | House | Read a second time |
2020-01-13 | House | Placed on calendar 1-15-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2020-01-13 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2019-11-06 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-09-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque |
2019-07-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Introduced |