WI SB215 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 299.85 (2) (b), 299.85 (2) (bm) and 299.85 (3m); to amend 299.85 (2m), 299.85 (3) (intro.), 299.85 (3) (d), 299.85 (3) (e), 299.85 (3) (em), 299.85 (7) (a) 1., 299.85 (7) (a) 2. and 299.85 (9m) (d); and to create 299.85 (8) (g) of the statutes; Relating to: time limits for correcting violations found by the environmental compliance audit program.
Title
Time limits for correcting violations found by the environmental compliance audit program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-26 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a second time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-19-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senators Miller and Hansen |
2019-08-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Jacque and Miller |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb215 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB215.pdf |