WI SB219 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Passed on November 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-26 - Published 11-26-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Passed on November 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-26 - Published 11-26-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 234.907 (1) (d), 234.907 (1) (f), 234.907 (2) (cm) and 234.907 (2) (f); and to create 234.907 (2) (L) and 234.907 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: agricultural development loan guarantee program administered by the Wisconsin Housing and Economic Development Authority. (FE)
Title
Agricultural development loan guarantee program administered by the Wisconsin Housing and Economic Development Authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-26 | Senate | Published 11-26-2019 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 11-25-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 62 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 11-19-2019 by directive of the President, pursuant to Senate Rule 44m (3) |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2019-11-08 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2019-11-07 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-07 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2019-11-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-11-07 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-07 | House | Read a second time |
2019-11-07 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2019-11-05 | House | Placed on calendar 11-7-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-11-05 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2019-10-03 | House | Representative Ohnstad added as a cosponsor |
2019-06-11 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a cosponsor |
2019-06-05 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senator L. Taylor added as a coauthor |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Introduced |