WI SB234 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 32.19 (4m) (a) (intro.) and 32.19 (4m) (b) 1. of the statutes; Relating to: limiting condemnation payments made by a county or a redevelopment or community development authority. (FE)
Title
Limiting condemnation payments made by a county or a redevelopment or community development authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Utilities and Housing |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb234 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB234.pdf |