WI SB239 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-9)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Published 7-11-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-9)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Published 7-11-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 66.0404 (4e) and 66.0414 of the statutes; Relating to: limiting the authority of the state and political subdivisions to regulate certain wireless facilities and authorizing political subdivisions to impose setback requirements for certain mobile service support structures. (FE)
Title
Limiting the authority of the state and political subdivisions to regulate certain wireless facilities and authorizing political subdivisions to impose setback requirements for certain mobile service support structures. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 6 rejected (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 5 rejected (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 4 rejected (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 3 rejected (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 2 rejected (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 6 rejected (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 5 rejected (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 4 rejected (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 3 rejected (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 2 rejected (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-10 | Senate | Published 7-11-2019 |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 7-10-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 14 |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 7-9-2019 |
2019-06-25 | Senate | LRB correction |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2019-06-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-06-18 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2019-06-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-06-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-06-18 | House | Read a second time |
2019-06-18 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2019-06-13 | House | Placed on calendar 6-18-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-06-10 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2019-06-05 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 27, Noes 5 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 6 rejected, Ayes 21, Noes 10 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 5 rejected, Ayes 20, Noes 10 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 4 rejected, Ayes 22, Noes 10 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 rejected, Ayes 21, Noes 10 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 rejected, Ayes 22, Noes 10 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 6 offered by Senators Carpenter, L. Taylor, Miller and Risser |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 5 offered by Senators Carpenter, Risser, L. Taylor and Ringhand |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 4 offered by Senators Carpenter, L. Taylor and Risser |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 offered by Senators Carpenter, L. Taylor, Miller and Risser |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senators Carpenter, L. Taylor, Miller and Risser |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Utilities and Housing, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Utilities and Housing, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator LeMahieu |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Utilities and Housing |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Introduced |