WI SB243 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 77.51 (13b); to renumber and amend 73.03 (71) (a), 73.03 (71) (b), 73.03 (71) (c) and 73.03 (71) (d); to amend 66.0615 (1m) (f) 2., 77.51 (11d), 77.51 (13) (intro.), 77.51 (13) (a), 77.51 (13) (c), 77.982 (2), 77.991 (2) and 77.9951 (2); and to create 66.0615 (1m) (g), 73.03 (71) (a) 2., 73.03 (71) (b) 2., 73.03 (71) (c) 2., 73.03 (71) (d) 2., 77.51 (7i), 77.51 (7j), 77.51 (13) (p) 7., 77.51 (13) (q), 77.51 (14) (n) 7., 77.51 (17) (g), 77.52 (3m), 77.52 (14) (c), 77.523, 77.585 (1g) and 77.585 (11) of the statutes; Relating to: requiring marketplace providers to collect and remit sales tax from third parties and reducing individual income tax rates based on the collection of sales and use tax from out-of-state retailers and marketplace providers. (FE)
Title
Requiring marketplace providers to collect and remit sales tax from third parties and reducing individual income tax rates based on the collection of sales and use tax from out-of-state retailers and marketplace providers. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Kooyenga |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Representative Katsma added as a cosponsor |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb243 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB243.pdf |