WI SB25 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 38.04 (4) (e) 8. and 343.71 (5) (h) of the statutes; Relating to: driver education instruction on human trafficking. (FE)
Title
Driver education instruction on human trafficking. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-11-11 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-30 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-30 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Representative Dittrich withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Representative Cabrera added as a cosponsor |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb25 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB25.pdf |