WI SB260 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 66.1105 (17) (g) of the statutes; Relating to: changing the 12 percent rule regarding the total value of taxable property included in the creation of a tax incremental financing district in the village of Ontario. (FE)
Title
Changing the 12 percent rule regarding the total value of taxable property included in the creation of a tax incremental financing district in the village of Ontario. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Testin |
2019-10-02 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Testin |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Trade |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb260 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB260.pdf |