WI SB27 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 29.063 (3) (intro.); and to create 29.063 (3m) of the statutes; Relating to: the handling of deer carcasses in the field, the transport of deer carcasses, and the suspension of portions of emergency rules of the Department of Natural Resources.
Title
The handling of deer carcasses in the field, the transport of deer carcasses, and the suspension of portions of emergency rules of the Department of Natural Resources.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-9-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Report without recommendation pursuant to s. 227.26 (2)(h), Wisconsin Statutes |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Joint Committee for Review of Administrative Rules report received pursuant to s.227.26(2)(g), Wisconsin Statutes |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb27 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB27.pdf |