WI SB276 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 85.193 (1) (a); to amend 85.193 (title) and 85.193 (2) (intro.); and to create 85.193 (1) (ag) and 85.193 (1) (bg) of the statutes; Relating to: exemption from local zoning ordinances for certain transportation project aggregate and concrete production sites. (FE)
Title
Exemption from local zoning ordinances for certain transportation project aggregate and concrete production sites. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Representative Skowronski added as a cosponsor |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb276 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB276.pdf |