WI SB277 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 84.06 (14) of the statutes; Relating to: sourcing materials from within the right-of-way of a highway improvement project. (FE)
Title
Sourcing materials from within the right-of-way of a highway improvement project. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-26 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2019-08-27 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-26 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Made a special order of buisness at 10:01 A.M. on 06-26-2019 by the committee on Senate Organization, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Representative Skowronski added as a cosponsor |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb277 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB277.pdf |