WI SB286 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 42-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 42-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 450.095 (title) and 450.095 (3); and to create 450.01 (16) (L), 450.095 (1) (ag) and (ar) and 450.095 (2m) of the statutes; Relating to: permitting pharmacists to prescribe certain contraceptives, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Permitting pharmacists to prescribe certain contraceptives, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Bernier |
2019-07-31 | Senate | Representative Ramthun withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Health and Human Services |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb286 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB286.pdf |