WI SB288 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 13.0963, 15.407 (19) and 440.023 of the statutes; Relating to: review of and reports concerning occupational licenses. (FE)
Title
Review of and reports concerning occupational licenses. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 3 recommended by Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-09-26 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 offered by Senator Kapenga |
2017-09-26 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senators Harsdorf and Kapenga |
2017-09-26 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Kapenga |
2017-08-24 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb288 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB288.pdf |