WI SB289 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber and amend 631.36 (5) (a) and 631.36 (5) (c); to amend 631.36 (5) (d); and to create 631.36 (5) (a) 2. and 631.36 (5) (c) 2. of the statutes; Relating to: notice of change in terms or premium amount for insurance policy renewal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Notice of change in terms or premium amount for insurance policy renewal.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04SenatePublished 3-4-2020
2020-03-04SenateReport approved by the Governor on 3-3-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 155
2020-02-28SenatePresented to the Governor on 2-28-2020
2020-02-25SenateReport correctly enrolled
2020-02-21SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2020-02-20HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-20HouseRead a third time and concurred in
2020-02-20HouseRules suspended
2020-02-20HouseOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-20HouseRead a second time
2020-02-18HouseMade a special order of business at 11:34 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21
2020-02-18HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2020-02-18HouseReport concurrence recommended by Committee on Insurance, Ayes 11, Noes 0
2019-10-17HouseExecutive action taken
2019-10-16HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Insurance
2019-10-08HouseReceived from Senate
2019-10-08SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2019-10-08SenateRead a third time and passed
2019-10-08SenateRules suspended
2019-10-08SenateOrdered to a third reading
2019-10-08SenateRead a second time
2019-10-04SenatePlaced on calendar 10-8-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2019-09-19SenateAvailable for scheduling
2019-09-19SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2019-09-19SenateExecutive action taken
2019-07-16SenatePublic hearing held
2019-06-21SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts
2019-06-21SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback