WI SB299 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-8)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-8)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: increasing the number of authorized positions for the Department of Health Services and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Increasing the number of authorized positions for the Department of Health Services and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-07-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Representative Rohrkaste added as a cosponsor |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb299 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB299.pdf |