WI SB3 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Published 5-2-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Published 5-2-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 218.0116 (2), 218.0116 (4) (a) and 218.0116 (4) (c); and to create 218.0116 (4) (am) of the statutes; Relating to: denial, suspension, and revocation of certain licenses related to motor vehicle dealers. (FE)
Title
Denial, suspension, and revocation of certain licenses related to motor vehicle dealers. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Cowles [R] | Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Sen. Patrick Testin [R] | Sen. David Hansen [D] |
Sen. Luther Olsen [R] | Rep. David Steffen [R] | Rep. Shae Sortwell [R] | Rep. John Spiros [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Senate | Published 5-2-2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 5-1-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 4 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-25-2019 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2019-04-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-04-09 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2019-04-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-04-09 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-04-09 | House | Read a second time |
2019-04-09 | House | Rules suspended and taken up |
2019-04-09 | House | Read |
2019-04-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-9-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Representative Tusler added as a cosponsor |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Introduced |