WI SB304 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-15)
Status: Passed on November 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-26 - Published 11-26-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-15)
Status: Passed on November 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-26 - Published 11-26-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 218.0163 (1) (a); and to create 218.0116 (1) (z) of the statutes; Relating to: prohibited practices of motor vehicle manufacturers, importers, and distributors and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Prohibited practices of motor vehicle manufacturers, importers, and distributors and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-08 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-26 | Senate | Published 11-26-2019 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 11-25-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 67 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 11-19-2019 by directive of the President, pursuant to Senate Rule 44m (3) |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2019-11-12 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-12 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2019-11-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-11-12 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-12 | House | Read a second time |
2019-11-07 | House | Placed on calendar 11-12-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-11-07 | House | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor |
2019-11-06 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2019-10-08 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 27, Noes 6 |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 24, Noes 9 |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senators Kapenga, Kooyenga, Craig, Bernier and Darling |
2019-10-07 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senators Bernier and Fitzgerald |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-8-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-10-02 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Introduced |