WI SB309 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 632.895 (17) (b) 3. of the statutes; Relating to: requiring coverage of the dispensing of an extended supply of contraceptives.
Title
Requiring coverage of the dispensing of an extended supply of contraceptives.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-10-01 | Senate | Senator Bewley added as a coauthor |
2019-08-14 | Senate | Representative Bowen added as a cosponsor |
2019-07-31 | Senate | Representative Kitchens added as a cosponsor |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb309 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB309.pdf |