WI SB31 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Available for scheduling
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to consolidate, renumber and amend 283.31 (8) (a), (b), (c); and to amend 20.370 (4) (mi) of the statutes; Relating to: permit fees for concentrated animal feeding operations. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permit fees for concentrated animal feeding operations. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30SenateAvailable for scheduling
2019-05-30SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2019-05-30SenateReport adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2019-05-30SenateExecutive action taken
2019-05-29SenateRepresentative Plumer added as a cosponsor
2019-05-23SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cowles
2019-04-30SenatePublic hearing held
2019-04-25SenateRepresentative VanderMeer added as a cosponsor
2019-02-19SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-02-08SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2019-02-08SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback