WI SB318 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-6)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-6)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to consolidate, renumber and amend 867.046 (2) (intro.), (a) and (b); and to amend 867.045 (1) (intro.) of the statutes; Relating to: obtaining evidence of the termination of certain property interests of a decedent.
Title
Obtaining evidence of the termination of certain property interests of a decedent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Olsen |
2019-09-26 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb318 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB318.pdf |