WI SB321 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 76.81; and to create 76.80 (2), (2m) and (5) of the statutes; Relating to: telephone company tax exemption for property used to provide broadband service. (FE)
Title
Telephone company tax exemption for property used to provide broadband service. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Utilities and Housing, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Utilities and Housing, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Utilities and Housing, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-12-04 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein |
2019-08-28 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Senator Cowles added as a coauthor |
2019-07-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-07-18 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Utilities and Housing |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb321 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB321.pdf |