WI SB324 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 49.46 (1) (a) 1m., 49.46 (1) (j), 49.47 (4) (ag) 2., 49.471 (6) (b) and 49.471 (7) (b) 1.; and to create 49.471 (6) (L) of the statutes; Relating to: extension of eligibility under the Medical Assistance program for post-partum women. (FE)
Title
Extension of eligibility under the Medical Assistance program for post-partum women. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-09-30 | Senate | Representative Haywood added as a cosponsor |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb324 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB324.pdf |