WI SB327 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 121.91 (4) (f) 1. and 121.91 (8) of the statutes; Relating to: the school district revenue limit adjustment for declining enrollment and the prior year base revenue hold harmless adjustment. (FE)
Title
The school district revenue limit adjustment for declining enrollment and the prior year base revenue hold harmless adjustment. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Howard Marklein [R] | Sen. Luther Olsen [R] | Sen. Romaine Quinn [R] | Rep. Joel Kitchens [R] |
Rep. Cindi Duchow [R] | Rep. Robert Kulp [R] | Rep. Kenneth Skowronski [R] | Rep. Ron Tusler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein |
2019-08-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb327 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB327.pdf |