WI SB331 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 23.33 (13) (br); to renumber 30.80 (6) (c) and 350.11 (3) (a) 4.; to renumber and amend 23.33 (1) (jm), 23.33 (13) (b) 4., 23.33 (13) (d), 23.335 (1) (zf), 23.335 (23) (c) 4., 23.335 (23) (g), 30.50 (9x), 350.01 (10r) and 350.11 (3) (c); to amend 23.33 (4c) (a) 3., 23.33 (4c) (a) 4., 23.33 (4c) (b) 3., 23.33 (4t), 23.33 (13) (b) 1., 23.33 (13) (b) 2., 23.33 (13) (b) 3., 23.33 (13) (bg), 23.33 (13) (cm), 23.33 (13) (dm), 23.335 (12) (a) 3., 23.335 (12) (a) 4., 23.335 (12) (b) 3., 23.335 (12) (j), 23.335 (23) (c) 1., 23.335 (23) (c) 2., 23.335 (23) (c) 3., 23.335 (23) (h), 30.681 (1) (bn), 30.681 (1) (c), 30.681 (2) (c), 30.681 (2) (d) 1. a., 30.686, 30.74 (1) (bn), 30.80 (6) (a) 1., 30.80 (6) (a) 2., 30.80 (6) (a) 3., 30.80 (6) (a) 4., 30.80 (6) (a) 5., 30.80 (6) (a) 6., 30.80 (6) (e), 59.54 (14) (g), 343.10 (1) (a), 343.10 (2) (a) 1., 343.10 (9), 343.21 (1) (jr), 350.101 (1) (d), 350.101 (2) (c), 350.106, 350.11 (3) (a) 1., 350.11 (3) (a) 2., 350.11 (3) (a) 3., 350.11 (3) (bm), 350.11 (3) (cm), 940.09 (1m) (b) and 940.25 (1m) (b); and to create 23.33 (1) (ib), 23.33 (1) (ih), 23.33 (1) (jd), 23.33 (1) (jh), 23.33 (1) (jk), 23.33 (4y), 23.33 (13) (b) 4b., 23.33 (13) (b) 5., 23.33 (13) (bm), 23.33 (13) (ce), 23.33 (13) (d) 2., 23.33 (13) (eg), 23.335 (1) (km), 23.335 (1) (nm), 23.335 (1) (zdr), 23.335 (1) (zer), 23.335 (1) (zet), 23.335 (12) (km), 23.335 (23) (c) 4b., 23.335 (23) (c) 5., 23.335 (23) (cg), 23.335 (23) (dm), 23.335 (23) (dr), 23.335 (23) (fm), 23.335 (23) (g) 2., 23.335 (23) (im), 30.50 (4n), 30.50 (4v), 30.50 (9fm), 30.50 (9m), 30.50 (9s), 30.50 (9t), 30.688, 30.80 (6) (am), 30.80 (6) (ar), 30.80 (6) (bg), 30.80 (6) (bn), 30.80 (6) (c) 2., 30.80 (6) (cm), 350.01 (9b), 350.01 (10c), 350.01 (10p), 350.01 (10q), 350.1075, 350.11 (3) (a) 4b., 350.11 (3) (a) 5., 350.11 (3) (am), 350.11 (3) (ar), 350.11 (3) (bg), 350.11 (3) (c) 2. and 350.11 (3) (e) of the statutes; Relating to: intoxicated operation of all-terrain vehicles, utility terrain vehicles, off-highway motorcycles, snowmobiles, and motorboats and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Intoxicated operation of all-terrain vehicles, utility terrain vehicles, off-highway motorcycles, snowmobiles, and motorboats and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Representative Born added as a cosponsor |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-08-29 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-08-19 | Senate | Department of Transportation Revocation report received pursuant to s.13.0965, Wisconsin Statutes |
2019-07-31 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-07-31 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb331 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB331.pdf |