WI SB34 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.625 (1) (h), 758.20 (3), 895.492 and 973.25 of the statutes; Relating to: creating a procedure for granting certificates of qualification for employment for persons convicted of a crime and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Creating a procedure for granting certificates of qualification for employment for persons convicted of a crime and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senator Larson added as a coauthor |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Senator Jacque added as a co-author of Senate Amendment 2 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Darling |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Representative Stubbs added as a cosponsor |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-09-23 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Darling |
2019-08-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Representative Spreitzer added as a cosponsor |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb34 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB34.pdf |