WI SB343 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 36.27 (1) (a); and to create 36.27 (1m) of the statutes; Relating to: University of Wisconsin System resident undergraduate tuition. (FE)
Title
University of Wisconsin System resident undergraduate tuition. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. Treig Pronschinske [R] | Rep. Samantha Kerkman [R] |
Sen. Mary Felzkowski [R] | Rep. Timothy Ramthun [R] | Rep. Shannon Zimmerman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Representative Skowronski added as a cosponsor |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Representative Allen added as a cosponsor |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Representative Tusler added as a cosponsor |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-08-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families |
2019-08-08 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb343 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB343.pdf |