WI SB35 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 22-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 22-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.115 (4) (fm) and 93.58 of the statutes; Relating to: grants for obtaining farm tractor rollover protection structures and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Grants for obtaining farm tractor rollover protection structures and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Testin |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Representative Plumer added as a cosponsor |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb35 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB35.pdf |