WI SB362 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-8)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - Published 11-23-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-8)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - Published 11-23-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 20.835 (2) (bc), 20.835 (2) (bd), 20.835 (2) (be), 20.835 (2) (bL), 20.835 (2) (bm), 20.835 (2) (bn), 20.835 (2) (bp), 20.835 (2) (en), 20.855 (4) (co), 41.155, 71.07 (3p), 71.07 (3r), 71.07 (3rm), 71.07 (3rn), 71.07 (5f), 71.07 (5h), 71.07 (8r), 71.10 (7e) (c) 2., 71.28 (3p), 71.28 (3r), 71.28 (3rm), 71.28 (3rn), 71.28 (5f), 71.28 (5h), 71.28 (8r), 71.47 (3p), 71.47 (3r), 71.47 (3rm), 71.47 (3rn), 71.47 (5f), 71.47 (5h), 71.47 (8r), 93.53, 93.535, 93.54, 93.545 and 93.547; to renumber 71.10 (7e) (c) 1.; and to amend 71.05 (6) (a) 15., 71.05 (6) (b) 47. b., 71.08 (1) (intro.), 71.10 (4) (i), 71.21 (4) (a), 71.26 (2) (a) 4., 71.30 (3) (f), 71.34 (1k) (g), 71.45 (2) (a) 10. and 71.49 (1) (f) of the statutes; Relating to: repealing obsolete refundable tax credits.
Title
Repealing obsolete refundable tax credits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-08 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Senate | Published 11-23-2019 |
2019-11-25 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 11-22-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 54 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 11-19-2019 by directive of the President, pursuant to Senate Rule 44m (3) |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2019-11-12 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-12 | House | Representative Allen added as a cosponsor |
2019-11-12 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2019-11-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-11-12 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-12 | House | Read a second time |
2019-11-12 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2019-11-07 | House | Placed on calendar 11-12-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-11-06 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2019-10-08 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 29, Noes 4 |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-8-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-09-18 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Representative Tusler added as a cosponsor |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Introduced |