WI SB367 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 103.36; to amend 111.322 (2m) (a), 111.322 (2m) (b) and 814.04 (intro.); and to create 103.135 of the statutes; Relating to: prohibiting an employer from relying on information about a prospective employee's compensation when making employment decisions or inquiring about a prospective employee's compensation and from restricting an employee's right to disclose compensation information and allowing actions in circuit court and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Prohibiting an employer from relying on information about a prospective employee's compensation when making employment decisions or inquiring about a prospective employee's compensation and from restricting an employee's right to disclose compensation information and allowing actions in circuit court and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb367 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB367.pdf |