WI SB376 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 941.29 (1g) (a) and 971.17 (1g); to amend 973.176 (1); and to create 941.29 (1g) (ah), 941.29 (1m) (ag), 941.29 (1m) (cm), 971.17 (1g) (b) and 973.136 of the statutes; Relating to: the possession of a firearm by a person who has committed a misdemeanor crime of domestic violence and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
The possession of a firearm by a person who has committed a misdemeanor crime of domestic violence and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Representative Gruszynski added as a cosponsor |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-13 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Representative Vining added as a cosponsor |
2019-08-29 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-08-29 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb376 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB376.pdf |